EP1497917 - INTERCONNECTING OF DIGITAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/03] | INTERCONNECTING OF DIGITAL DEVICES TECHNICAL FIELD | ||
[2008/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENHAM, John 30 O'Neil Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 02 /
CRITCHLOW, John 34 Sunset Drive Northborough, MA 01532 / US | 03 /
AMIRTHARAJAH, Rajeevan 79 Transit Street 1 Providence, RI 02906 / US | 04 /
NAYLOR, Mark, c/o Intel Corp. SC-202 Foreign Filing Adm, 2200 Mission Collage Bldv Santa Clara CA 95052-8119 / US | 05 /
SIMON, Thomas 23 Royal Crest Drive 7 Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
BENHAM, John 30 O'Neil Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | ||
02 /
CRITCHLOW, John 34 Sunset Drive Northborough, MA 01532 / US | |||
03 /
AMIRTHARAJAH, Rajeevan 79 Transit Street 1 Providence, RI 02906 / US | |||
04 /
NAYLOR, Mark 197 Pond Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | |||
05 /
SIMON, Thomas 23 Royal Crest Drive 7 Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03716978.6 | 04.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003US10319 | Priority number, date | US20020126754 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 126754 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090352 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497917 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1497917 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/48, H03H7/38, G06F13/40 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
G06F13/4086 (EP,US);
H03H7/38 (EP,US);
H03H7/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG VON DIGITALEN GERÄTEN | [2005/03] | English: | INTERCONNECTING OF DIGITAL DEVICES | [2008/08] | French: | INTERCONNEXION DE DISPOSITIFS DIGITAUX | [2005/03] |
Former [2005/03] | INTERCONNECTING OF DIGITAL DEVICES TECHNICAL FIELD | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2008 | BE | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | GB | 04.04.2009 | IE | 04.04.2009 | LU | 04.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
GB | 04.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.04.2009 | ||
LU | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
GB | 04.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.04.2009 | ||
LU | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
GB | 04.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
GB | 04.04.2009 | ||
IE | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 16.07.2008 | |
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6275062 (STARR JONATHAN E [US]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12-14,16,17,19-21,23 * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 38; figure 4 * * column 9, lines 26-33 *[A] 25-27,29,31,32 |