30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
01.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
18.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
21.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
21.08.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
31.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
15.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
12.09.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
28.08.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.08.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.03.2008 |
Change - German title |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.04.2007 |
Change: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.10.2006 |
First examination report |
|
30.09.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.05.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
10.05.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |
15.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |
17.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|