EP1480614 - EMULSION CONTAINING HYDROPHOBIC NANODROPS WITH BOUND HEMOGLOBIN MOLECULES IN A HYDROPHILIC PHASE AS A BLOOD SUBSTITUTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hemofarm Koncern A.D. Beogradski Put BB 26300 Vrsac / YU | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUGARSKI, Branko Bulevar kralja Aleksandra 292/V YU-Belgrad / YU | 02 /
DOVEZENSKI, Nebojsa Krudedolska 3/II YU-Belgrad / YU | 03 /
STOJANOVIC, Nevenka Studentski trg 6/V YU-Belgrad / YU | 04 /
BUGARSKI, Diana Bulevar krajla Aleksandra 292/V YU-Belgrad / YU | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03717133.7 | 06.03.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003DE00726 | Priority number, date | DE2002109860 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10209860 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03074022 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480614 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480614 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/107, A61K9/51, A61K38/42 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/0026 (EP);
A61K38/42 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHOBE NANOTROPFEN MIT GEBUNDENEN HÄMOGLOBINMOLEKÜLEN IN HYDROPHILER PHASE ENTHALTENDE EMULSION ALS BLUTERSATZSTOFF | [2008/17] | English: | EMULSION CONTAINING HYDROPHOBIC NANODROPS WITH BOUND HEMOGLOBIN MOLECULES IN A HYDROPHILIC PHASE AS A BLOOD SUBSTITUTE | [2004/49] | French: | EMULSION CONTENANT DES GOUTTES HYDROPHOBES DE L'ORDRE DU NANOMETRE AVEC DES MOLECULES D'HEMOGLOBINE LIEES EN PHASE HYDROPHILE, UTILISEE COMME SUBSTITUT DU SANG | [2004/49] |
Former [2004/49] | HYDROPHOBE NANOTROPFEN MIT GEBUNDENEN H MOGLOBINMOLEK L EN IN HYDROPHILER PHASE ENTHALTENDE EMULSION ALS BLUTERSATZSTOFF | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 05.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2005 | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IE | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 15.10.2008 | |
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BG | 15.01.2009 | |
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5061688 (BEISSINGER RICHARD L [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]US5152923 (WEDER HANS G [CH], et al) [A] 1-8* claim - * |