EP1483165 - CONTAINER WITH A COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jokey Plastik Gummersbach GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 9 51645 Gummersbach / DE | [2007/22] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Jokey Plastik Gummerbach GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 9 51645 Gummersbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENGEL, Gustav Kölner Strasse 45 51645 Gummersbach / DE | 02 /
DIESTERBECK, Frank Wolferschlah 2 51709 Marienheide / DE | 03 /
Georgiadia, Robert George Dorfstr. 37 51491 Overath / DE | 04 /
Blumenschein, Marcus Hauptstr. 23 51709 Marienheide / DE | [2005/06] |
Former [2004/50] | 01 /
DENGEL, Gustav Kölner Strasse 45 51645 Gummersbach / DE | ||
02 /
DIESTERBECK, Frank Wolferschlah 2 51709 Marienheide / DE | |||
03 /
GEORGIADIS, Robert, Guido Moitzfeld 72 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
04 /
BLUMENSCHEIN, Marcus Am Südhang 3 51709 Marienheide / DE | Representative(s) | Gudat, Axel Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Gudat, Axel, Dr. Lippert, Stachow & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03717138.6 | 06.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003DE00744 | Priority number, date | DE2002110486 | 11.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210486 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03076290 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483165 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483165 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/06 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
B65D43/0212 (EP,US);
B65D2251/023 (EP,US);
B65D2401/10 (EP,US);
B65D2401/55 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00509 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00555 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00629 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00685 (EP,US);
B65D2543/0074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | 16.09.2004 | LT | 16.09.2004 | LV | 16.09.2004 | MK | 16.09.2004 | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT DECKEL | [2004/50] | English: | CONTAINER WITH A COVER | [2004/50] | French: | RECIPIENT MUNI D'UN COUVERCLE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 06.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1052183 (SUPERFOS AS [DK]) [AD] 1 * figures 1,2,5,7 *; | [A]EP1122184 (EMBALLATOR LAGAN PLAST AKTIEBO [SE]) [A] 1* figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US3753512 | EP0565967 | EP1052183 |