EP1499484 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FILLED GRANULATES CONSISTING OF HIGH OR ULTRA-HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/04] | FILLED GRANULATES CONSISTING OF HIGH OR ULTRA-HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID GRANULATES | ||
[2008/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ticona GmbH Professor-Staudinger-Strasse 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUSIK, Meinhard Holtstegstrasse 41 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
HAFTKA, Stanislaw Jahnstrasse 22 46145 Oberhausen / DE | 03 /
LÜDTKE, Kerstin Lessingstrasse 4 46499 Hamminkeln / DE | [2005/04] | Application number, filing date | 03717302.8 | 15.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003EP03903 | Priority number, date | DE2002117232 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10217232 | [2005/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03086724 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499484 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1499484 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/12, B29B9/14, B01J2/00, B29C47/38, C08L23/06 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08J3/22 (KR);
B01J2/20 (EP,US);
B29B9/12 (EP,US);
B29B9/14 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
C08J5/10 (KR);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/0675 (EP,US);
B29K2023/0683 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0008 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0032 (EP,US);
B29K2105/06 (EP,US);
B29K2105/126 (EP,US);
B29K2105/16 (EP,US);
B29L2031/52 (EP,US);
B29L2031/712 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GEFÜLLTER GRANULATE AUS POLYETHYLENEN HOHEN BZW. ULTRAHOHEN MOLEKULARGEWICHTS | [2008/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FILLED GRANULATES CONSISTING OF HIGH OR ULTRA-HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENES | [2008/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE GRANULES CHARGEES COMPRENANT DES POLYETHYLENES A MASSE MOLECULAIRE ELEVEE OU BIEN ULTRA-ELEVEE | [2008/11] |
Former [2005/04] | GEFÜLLTE GRANULATE AUS POLYETHYLENEN HOHEN BZW. ULTRAHOHEN MOLEKULARGEWICHTS UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2005/04] | FILLED GRANULATES CONSISTING OF HIGH OR ULTRA-HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID GRANULATES | ||
Former [2005/04] | GRANULES CONSTITUES DE MATERIAUX DE REMPLISSAGE ET DE POLYETHYLENES A MASSE MOLECULAIRE ELEVEE OU ULTRA-ELEVEE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.07.2008 | CZ | 02.07.2008 | DK | 02.07.2008 | EE | 02.07.2008 | FI | 02.07.2008 | IE | 02.07.2008 | IT | 02.07.2008 | NL | 02.07.2008 | RO | 02.07.2008 | SI | 02.07.2008 | SK | 02.07.2008 | TR | 02.07.2008 | BG | 02.10.2008 | SE | 02.10.2008 | GR | 03.10.2008 | ES | 13.10.2008 | PT | 02.12.2008 | HU | 03.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
HU | 03.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 02.07.2008 | |
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 02.07.2008 | |
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | NL | 02.07.2008 | |
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.07.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0315481 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 4 - line 12 * * page 6, line 11 - line 38 * * page 7, line 7 - line 45 * * page 10, line 31 - line 36 * * abstract *; | [A]US4853427 (HERTEN JORIS F [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 3 - line 7 * * column 9, line 39 - line 51 * * abstract *; | [A]US4973626 (WILKUS EDWARD V [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US5055248 (MOTOOKA MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 28 - line 32 * * column 4, line 51 - line 53 * * column 7, line 48 - line 57 * * column 8, line 10 - line 33 * * column 10, line 54 - line 62 * * column 11, line 36 - column 12, line 12 *; | [A]EP0472237 (DSM NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0590507 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 20 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 12 * * abstract *; | [DA]US5352732 (HOWARD EDWARD G [US]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]EP0690095 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 3 - line 5 * * page 3, line 17 - line 59 * * page 4, line 34 - line 53 * * abstract *; | [DA]EP0889087 (BUNA SOW LEUNA OLEFINVERB GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US5948557 (ONDECK RAYMOND R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 9 * * column 7, line 5 - line 44 * * column 9, line 41 - line 48 * * column 12, line 61 - column 13, line 6 * * abstract *; | [X]US2002010241 (PITTERI SILVIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0036] * * paragraphs [0065] , [0076] * * claims 1-4 * |