EP1512068 - ACCESS TO A WIDE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BERKEL, Cornelis, H. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MEUWISSEN, Patrick, P., E. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/10] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03717500.7 | 07.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003IB01891 | Priority number, date | EP20020077034 | 24.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02077034 | EP20020078618 | 04.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02078618 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03100599 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1512068 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512068 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
G06F9/3893 (EP,US);
G06F15/8061 (EP,US);
G06F9/30025 (EP,US);
G06F9/30032 (EP,US);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/3824 (EP,US);
G06F9/3834 (EP,US);
G06F9/3877 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US);
G06F9/3887 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUGRIFF ZUM BREITEN SPEICHER | [2005/10] | English: | ACCESS TO A WIDE MEMORY | [2005/10] | French: | ACCES A UNE MEMOIRE LARGE | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Request for further processing for: | 13.03.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.09.2007 | BE | 05.09.2007 | CH | 05.09.2007 | CY | 05.09.2007 | CZ | 05.09.2007 | DK | 05.09.2007 | EE | 05.09.2007 | FI | 05.09.2007 | LI | 05.09.2007 | NL | 05.09.2007 | RO | 05.09.2007 | SI | 05.09.2007 | SK | 05.09.2007 | TR | 05.09.2007 | BG | 05.12.2007 | SE | 05.12.2007 | GR | 06.12.2007 | ES | 16.12.2007 | PT | 06.02.2008 | HU | 06.03.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | LU | 07.05.2008 | IT | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CY | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
TR | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
HU | 06.03.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LU | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CY | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
HU | 06.03.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LU | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CY | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LU | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CY | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CY | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 05.09.2007 | |
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 16.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4949247 (STEPHENSON R ASHLEY [US], et al); | [A]US5426754 (GRICE DONALD G [US], et al); | [XY]US5689653 (KARP ALAN H [US], et al); | [X]US5928350 (SHU DAVID B [US], et al); | [A]US6006315 (PARK HEONCHUL [US]) |