EP1476413 - PROCESS AND CATALYST FOR PURIFYING PHENOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Sabic Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYKMAN, Arkady Samulovich pr. Grazhdanskii, 13, kv. 20 St.Petersburg, 195220 / RU | 02 /
KRASY, Boris Vasil'evich ul. Tambasova d.8, Korpus 1, Kv. 204 Saint Petersburg, 198829 / RU | 03 /
SHAVANDIM, Yury Alekseevich ul. Zvezdnaya d. 8,kv. 78 Saint Petersburg, 196193 / RU | 04 /
PINSON, Viktor Valdimirovich Primorskii pr. d. 41, kv 10 Saint Petersburg, 197183 / RU | 05 /
YAVSHITS, Genrikh Petrovich ul. Shishkova d. 20, kv. 14 Saint Petersburg, 196605 / RU | 06 /
ZINENKOV, Andrey Vladimirovich pr. Gagarina d 14, korpus 5, kv. 103 Saint Petersburg 196211 / RU | 07 /
FULMER, John W. 78 Park Ridge Drive Mount Vernon, IN 47620 / US | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Szary, Anne C., et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03717881.1 | 03.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003US03090 | Priority number, date | RU20020103669 | 08.02.2002 Original published format: RU 2002103669 | US20030354270 | 30.01.2003 Original published format: US 354270 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03066554 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476413 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C39/04, C07C37/86, B01J27/053 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
B01J27/053 (EP,US);
C07C37/86 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/031 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/86, C07C39/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KATALYSATOR ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON PHENOL | [2004/47] | English: | PROCESS AND CATALYST FOR PURIFYING PHENOL | [2004/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET CATALYSEUR DE PURIFICATION DE PHENOL | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60132650 ; | [A]FR1445829 (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO) [A] 1 * claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851114), vol. 009, no. 287, Database accession no. (C - 314), & JP60132650 A 19850715 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN;OTHERS: 0J) [A] 4,10,11 * abstract * | Examination | WO03066555 |