EP1490032 - PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING POLYMERIC MICROSPHERES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUISER, Marcia 480 Belmont Street, Apt. 2 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 02 /
BALDWIN, Samuel, P. 20 Hardy Avenue, Apartment A Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2005/09] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
BUISER, Marcia 480 Belmont Street, Apt. 2 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | ||
02 /
BALDWIN, Samuel, P. 6 Clarendon Street Newton, MA 02460 / US | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03718083.3 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US09471 | Priority number, date | US20020109966 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: US 109966 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082250 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490032 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490032 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61L24/04, A61L24/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61F2/0036 (EP,US);
A61K49/0452 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,US);
A61L24/001 (EP,US);
A61L24/0036 (EP,US);
A61L24/06 (EP,US);
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L31/048 (EP,US);
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (EP,US);
A61L2430/36 (EP,US);
B29B2009/125 (EP,US);
B29B2009/166 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/06, C08L29/04 (EP,US);
A61L27/16, C08L29/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/048, C08L29/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2006/36] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMEREN MICROSPHÄREN | [2005/01] | English: | PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING POLYMERIC MICROSPHERES | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE MICROSPHERES POLYMERES | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09316271 ; | [A]US5571182 (ERSEK ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * claim - *; | [A]WO9639464 (BARD INC C R [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * claim - *; | [A]US2001051670 (GOUPIL DENNIS W [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * claim - *; | [A]DE10026620 (QUELLE GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-36 * claim - *; | [A]WO0170291 (BIOSPHERE MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-36 * claim - *; | [A]EP0402031 (AMERICAN MED SYST [US]) [A] 1-36 * claim - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 08, Database accession no. 1998-082801, XP002250507 & JPH09316271 A 19971209 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * |