EP1513692 - BOX HAVING A MULTILENS STAR DECORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/11] | BOX HAVING A MULTILENS STAR DECORATION AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | ||
[2011/34] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEBERLEIN, Gerald, J. W6344 Cedar Cliff Drive Hortonville, WI 54944 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Mabey, Katherine Frances, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Mabey, Katherine Frances, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/11] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03718164.1 | 01.04.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003US10095 | Priority number, date | US20020172758 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: US 172758 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03107042 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1513692 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/14, B44F7/00, B44C5/00 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
B44C1/14 (EP,US);
B44C5/00 (EP,US);
B44F7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/11] | B44B5/02, B44F7/00, B44C5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/40] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHACHTEL MIT EINER STERNFÖRMIGEN DEKORATION AUS MEHREREN LINSEN | [2011/34] | English: | BOX HAVING A MULTILENS STAR DECORATION | [2011/34] | French: | BOITE A ETOILES A LENTILLES MULTIPLES | [2011/34] |
Former [2005/11] | SCHACHTEL MIT EINER STERNFÖRMIGEN DEKORATION AUS MEHREREN LINSEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2005/11] | BOX HAVING A MULTILENS STAR DECORATION AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | ||
Former [2005/11] | BOITE A ETOILES A LENTILLES MULTIPLES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3961575 (RODABAUGH ROWENA ANN) [Y] 24-26 * see abstract; column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-23,27-57; | [YA]DE1257043 (TEFAL SA) [Y] 24-26 * column 3, line 43 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-6 * [A] 1-23,27-57; | [YA]US4427733 (POELL MARTIN [AT], et al) [Y] 25,26 * see abstract; column 1, line 6 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 * [A] 1-23,27-57; | [A]EP0419773 (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]) [A] 1-57 * the whole document *; | [A]US3357772 (ROWLAND WILLIAM P) [A] 1-57 * the whole document *; | [A]US5156863 (PRICONE ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * the whole document *; | [A]US4159677 (SMITH FRANKLIN G) [A] 32-57 * the whole document * |