Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007111307 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | US60386506 | 24.11.2006 | CA0300617 | 24.04.2003 | US51143305 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005170501 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | CA0300617 | 24.04.2003 | US51143305 | 15.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003222697 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2003 | A8 | AU2003222697 | 10.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | CA0300617 | 24.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1499711 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2010 | B1 | EP1499711 | 26.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | CA0300617 | 24.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE483015T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | CA0300617 | 24.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2483756 | 03.01.2012 | C | CA2483756 | 06.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | CA0300617 | 24.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60334372D1 | 11.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | CA0300617 | 24.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03091380 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2004 | A3 | WO03091380 | 06.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2353380T | 01.03.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US37478602 | 24.04.2002 |