EP1499711 - METHOD FOR PREPARING TISSUE CONSTRUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Organogenesis, Inc. 150 Dan Road Canton, MA 02021 / US | [2009/50] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Biogentis Inc. 1336, rue Duquet Sillery, Québec G1S 1A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGER, François A. 1336, rue Duquet Sillery, Québec G1S 1A9 / CA | 02 /
BERGERON, François 2051, rue Richer, apt. 12 Sainte-Foy, Québec G1V 2P5 / CA | 03 /
GERMAIN, Lucie 232, du Trèfle Saint-Augustin, Québec G3A 1H8 / CA | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03718573.3 | 24.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003CA00617 | Priority number, date | US20020374786P | 24.04.2002 Original published format: US 374786 P | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03091380 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1499711 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1499711 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
C12N5/0691 (EP,US);
C12N5/0697 (EP,US);
C12N2502/1323 (EP,US);
C12N2502/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/04] | C12N5/06, C12N5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEWEBEKONSTRUKTEN | [2005/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING TISSUE CONSTRUCTS | [2005/04] | French: | METHODE DE PREPARATION DE CONSTRUITS TISSULAIRES | [2010/03] |
Former [2005/04] | METHODE DE PREPARATION DE PRODUITS D'ASSEMBLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 18.07.2005 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2006/44] | 02.05.2007 | Resumption of proceedings | [2007/19] | 18.07.2005 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2007/19] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | PT | 31.01.2011 | IE | 24.04.2011 | LU | 24.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 24.04.2011 | ||
LU | 24.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 24.04.2011 | ||
LU | 24.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 24.04.2011 | ||
LU | 24.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 24.04.2011 | ||
LU | 24.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 24.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 29.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5750329 (QUINN FREDERICK D [US], et al); | [X]US6133030 (BHATIA SANGEETA [US], et al) [X] 1-15,18-26 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0066036 (MASSACHUSETTS GEN HOSPITAL [US]) [X] 1-16,18-26 * the whole document *; | [XA] - L'HEUREUX N ET AL, "A completely biological tissue-engineered human blood vessel", FASEB JOURNAL, (1998), vol. 12, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 47 - 57, XP002942845 [X] 18-26 * the whole document * [A] 17 |