EP1483693 - COMPUTER REPRESENTATION OF A DATA TREE STRUCTURE AND THE ASSOCIATED ENCODING/DECODING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM SA 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASSALLE, Edmond 17, Rue du Hingar F-22300 Lannion / FR | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet - B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2004/50] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03718905.7 | 21.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003FR00576 | Priority number, date | FR20020002664 | 27.02.2002 Original published format: FR 0202664 | [2004/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03073320 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1483693 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483693 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G06F16/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DARSTELLUNG EINER BAUMDATENSTRUKTUR UND ASSOZIIERTES KODIERUNGS-/DEKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2004/50] | English: | COMPUTER REPRESENTATION OF A DATA TREE STRUCTURE AND THE ASSOCIATED ENCODING/DECODING METHODS | [2004/50] | French: | REPRESENTATION INFORMATIQUE D'UNE STRUCTURE DE DONNEES ARBORESCENTE ET METHODES DE CODAGE/DECODAGE ASSOCIEES | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | CZ | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IE | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | SI | 06.08.2008 | SK | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | HU | 07.02.2009 | LU | 21.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
LU | 21.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
LU | 21.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5752243 (REITER ALLEN [IL], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, line 43 - column 6, line 55 ** column 7, line 36 - column 7, line 50 *; | [X] - CHANG H, "BUBBLE STRUCTURE AND OPERATION TO FACILITATE TREE TRAVERSAL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19840201), vol. 26, no. 9, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 4766 - 4777, XP000714569 [X] 1-4 * page 4767, line 14 - page 4767, line 18 * * page 4769, line 14 - page 4770, line 12 * * page 4773, line 18 - page 4774, line 7 * * page 4774, line 16 - page 4775, line 36 * | [A] - LAM S W ET AL, "REPRESENTING LEXICONS BY MODIFIED TRIE FOR FAST PARTIAL STRING MATCHING", CHARACTER RECOGNITION TECHNOLOGIES. SAN JOSE, FEB. 1 - 2, 1993, BELLINGHAM, SPIE, US, (1993), ISBN 0-8194-1139-6, pages 229 - 237, XP000628870 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 230, line 31 - page 232, line 11 * * page 233, line 18 - page 236, line 8 * | [A] - DUNDAS III J A, "IMPLEMENTING DYNAMIC MINIMAL-PREFIX TRIES", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, (19911001), vol. 21, no. 10, ISSN 0038-0644, pages 1027 - 1040, XP000297892 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 1027, line 1 - page 1029, line 14 * * page 1030, line 19 - page 1031, line 17 * * page 1033, line 33 - page 1035, line 29 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/spe.4380211004 |