EP1499133 - MOTION VECTOR ENCODING METHOD AND MOTION VECTOR DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Satoshi 7-17, Otokoyamashigetsu Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8361 / JP | 02 /
KADONO, Shinya 7-25-204, Koshienguchi 1-chome Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8113 / JP | 03 /
HAGAI, Makoto 22-402, Oedaminami-machi 8-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0051 / JP | 04 /
ABE, Kiyofumi 16-1-213, Miyamae-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0074 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03719091.5 | 10.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP04540 | Priority number, date | JP20020121051 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002121051 | JP20020173865 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002173865 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03092299 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499133 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1499133 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/32 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/513 (EP,US);
H04N19/517 (EP,US);
H04N19/573 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSVEKTORCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND BEWEGUNGSVEKTORDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/03] | English: | MOTION VECTOR ENCODING METHOD AND MOTION VECTOR DECODING METHOD | [2005/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE CODAGE ET PROCEDE DE DECODAGE DE VECTEURS DE MOUVEMENT | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2003 | Translation filed | 05.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07100277.8 / EP1773067 | EP07109634.1 / EP1821546 | EP10160075.7 / EP2216995 | EP10160082.3 / EP2216996 | EP10160084.9 / EP2216997 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | BE | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | IE | 10.04.2008 | LU | 10.04.2008 | CH | 30.04.2008 | LI | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
LU | 10.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
LU | 10.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 09.04.2008 | |
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0944245 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1-35 * abstract * * paragraphs [0077] - [0099] *; | [A]US5978048 (LEE SANG-HOON [KR]) [A] 1-35 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 42 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 14 *; | [X] - TAKAHIRO FUKUHARA ET AL, "Very Low Bit-Rate Video Coding with Block Partitioning and Adaptive Selection of Two Time-Differential Frame Memories", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199702), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1051-8215, XP011014349 [X] 1,2,4,12,13,15,16,18,26-35 * abstract * * paragraphs [04.C] , [04.E] * | [X] - "WORKING DRAFT NUMBER 2, REVISION 2 (WD-2)", DOCUMENT JVT-B118R2, (20020129), pages 1 - 10, XP001086630 [X] 1-35 * paragraphs [4.4.6.1] , [07.4] * | [A] - FAOUZI KOSSENTINI ET AL, "Predictive RD Optimized Motion Estimation for Very Low Bit-Rate Video Coding", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (199712), vol. 15, no. 9, ISSN 0733-8716, XP011054728 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0537915 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A] - "H.26L test model long term number 6(TML-6) draft0", ITU-TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDIZATION SECTOR STUDY GROUP 16 IDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP (VCEG), vol. VCEG-L45, (2001), pages 28 - 33, URL: http://kbs.cs.tu-berlin-de/-stewe/vceg/TMLDocs/VCEG-L45do.doc, (20030528), XP002971811 | [A] - "MPEG-4 no subete", SUKEKAZU MIKI, KOGYO CHOSAKAI PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (19980930), pages 44 - 49, ISBN 4-7693-1167-2, XP002971812 |