EP1502801 - MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2008/41] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSUGI, Makoto Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
ZENNO, Toru Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Masaichi Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03719209.3 | 25.04.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003JP05365 | Priority number, date | JP20020127107 | 26.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002127107 | [2005/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091059 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1502801 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1502801 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K20/00, B62M11/04, F16H61/28 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
B62K11/04 (EP,US);
F16H61/2807 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORRAD | [2005/05] | English: | MOTORCYCLE | [2005/05] | French: | MOTOCYCLE | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2004 | Translation filed | 17.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | BE | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | HU | 09.04.2009 | IE | 25.04.2009 | LU | 25.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
IE | 25.04.2009 | ||
LU | 25.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.04.2009 | ||
LU | 25.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/16] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6073719 (OHMIKA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* column 4, line 54 - column 4, line 58; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPS6181042U ; | [Y]JPH1159551 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2001124203 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US2002023795 (NAGAI HISAO [JP]); | [Y]JP2002067741 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]US6357545 (HORI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) |