EP1495415 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MOBILE IP HOME AGENT REDUNDANCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UTStarcom, Incorporated 1275 Harbor Bay Parkway Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2007/11] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states 3COM Corporation 5500 Great America Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORELLA, Michael, S. 1208 Haverhill Circle Naperville, IL 60563 / US | 02 /
SHARMA, Abhishek 20 Prairie Pointe Lane Streamwood, IL 60107 / US | 03 /
WARRIER, Chandra 1120 E. Algonquin Road 30 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | 04 /
BHATIA, Ravideep 4750 Kenilworth 101 Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | 05 /
ALEX, Arun 236 Cedarfield Drive Bartlett, IL 60103 / US | 06 /
SUDHIR, Kunnath 661 Tall Grass Drive Bolingbrook IL 60440 / US | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/02] | 01 /
BORELLA, Michael, S. 1208 Haverhill Circle Naperville, IL 60563 / US | ||
02 /
SHARMA, Abhishek 1870 West Palm Drive 377 Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | |||
03 /
WARRIER, Chandra 1120 E. Algonquin Road 30 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | |||
04 /
BHATIA, Ravideep 4750 Kenilworth 101 Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | |||
05 /
ALEX, Arun 1300 East Algonquin Road 1S Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | |||
06 /
SUDHIR, Kunnath 1258 Pine Valley 207 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03719546.8 | 25.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US10107 | Priority number, date | US20020113184 | 01.04.2002 Original published format: US 113184 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03085540 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1495415 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
H04W8/12 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR MOBIL-IP-HEIMATAGENT-REDUNDANZ | [2005/02] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MOBILE IP HOME AGENT REDUNDANCY | [2005/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR REDONDANCE D'AGENTS DOMESTIQUES A PROTOCOLE INTERNET MOBILE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1058421 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-10 *; | [X]US6195705 (LEUNG KENT K [US]) [X] 1-10 * column A * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 54 * * column 6, line 34 - column 9, line 13 * * column 10, line 26 - column 23, line 53 * * figures 1-10 *; | [X] - HEISSENHUBER F ET AL, "HOME AGENT REDUNDANCY AND LOAD BALANCING IN MOBILE IPV6", BROADBAND COMMUNICATIONS. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONALIFIP-IEEE CONFERENCE ON BROADBAND COMMUNICATIONS, XX, XX, (19991110), pages 235 - 244, XP009002035 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * section 3 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - BJORN CHAMBLESS PORTLAND STATE UNIVERSITY JIM BINKLEY OREGON GRADUATE INSTITUTE, "HARP - Home Agent Redundancy Protocol; draft-chambless-mobileip-harp- 00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (19971027), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015011615 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * sections 1-4 * | International search | [YP]US6487605 (LEUNG KENT K [US]); | [YE]US2003095523 (KORUS MICHAEL F [US], et al) |