EP1504371 - EMBEDDED CONTROLLER AND REMOTE SERVER FOR SENDING AND RETRIEVING DATA VIA A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axeda Corporation 25 Forbes Boulevard Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Axeda Systems Operating Company, Inc. 21, Oxford Road Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Axeda Systems Operating Company, Inc. Cabot Business Park, 89 Forbes Boulevard Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, James, R. 44 Dover Circle Franklin, MA 02038 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | Epping, Hermann, Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03719774.6 | 16.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US11707 | Priority number, date | US20020124181 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: US 124181 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090119 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504371 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504371 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
G06F16/95 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/09] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINGEBETTETER CONTROLLER UND ENTFERNTER SERVER ZUM SENDEN UND WIEDERFINDEN VON DATEN ÜBER EIN NEZTWERK | [2005/06] | English: | EMBEDDED CONTROLLER AND REMOTE SERVER FOR SENDING AND RETRIEVING DATA VIA A NETWORK | [2005/06] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE INTEGREE ET SERVEUR ELOIGNE SERVANT A ENVOYER ET A EXTRAIRE DES DONNEES PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN RESEAU | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 12.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20010017849 ; | [A]WO0210919 (EMATION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-88 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 4 ** page 8, line 11 - line 13 *; | [XY]WO0225501 (EMATION INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14,18-46,50-74,78-88 * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * figure 3 * * page 18, line 12 - line 18 * * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 15 - line 22 * * page 5, line 13 - line 15 * * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 4 * * page 11, line 18 - line 21 * * page 12, line 24 - line 25 * * page 13, line 7 - line 10 * [Y] 15-17,47-49,75-77; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 56, Database accession no. 2001-511657, XP002253876 & KR20010017849 A 20010305 (KOREA ELECTRONICS & TELECOM RES INST) [Y] 15,16,47,48,75,76 * abstract * | [Y] - BOX D ET AL, "Simple Object Access Protocol (SOAP) 1.1", ONLINE ARTICLE, (20000508), URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/SOAP/, (20030805), XP002250270 [Y] 17,49,77 * page 1, line 19 - line 24 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 6 * | [A] - EDWARD STEINFELD, "From Standalone to Internet Appliance", ONLINE ARTICLE, (200004), URL: http://www.chipcenter.com/circuitcellar/april00/pdf/c0400espdf.pdf, (20020610), XP002201937 [A] 1-88 * whole document * |