EP1496780 - GRILLING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Commercial Refrigeration, Inc. PO Box 4800 Carrier Parkway Syracuse, NY 13221 / US | For all designated states McDonald's Corporation 2915 Jorie Boulevard Oakbrook, IL 60523 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Carrier Commercial Refrigeration, Inc. PO Box 4800, Carrier Parkway Syracuse, NY 13221 / US | ||
For all designated states McDonald's Corporation 2915 Jorie Boulevard Oakbrook, IL 60523 / US | |||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Carrier Commercial Refrigeration, Inc. PO Box 4800, Carrier Parkway Syracuse, NY 13221 / US | ||
For all designated states McDonald's Corporation 2915 Jorie Boulevard Oakbrook, IL 60523 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDS, Jeffrey L. 2216 Country Court Freeport, IL 61032 / US | 02 /
PELLICANE, Jack 146 Lucinda Lane Wyomissing, PA 19610 / US | 03 /
CONLIN, James, D. 5655 Daniel Drive South Beloit, IL 61080 / US | 04 /
FRANKEN, Thomas, J. 11837 Bend River Road Roscoe, IL 61032 / US | 05 /
FRANKLIN, Andrew, Paul 2359 Kruse Drive Beloit, WI 53511 / US | 06 /
GINNER, Randy, L. 1222 Elm Street Beloit, WI 53511 / US | 07 /
GLAVAN, Ronald, J. 210 Countryside Drive Rockton, IL 61072 / US | 08 /
GLAWE, Scott, A. 11823 Wagon Lane Roscoe, IL 61073 / US | 09 /
HILL, David, A. 424 Wynstone Way Rockton, IL 61072 / US | 10 /
NEWBERRY, Michael, J. 110 S.W. New Brunswick Lane Poplar Grove, IL 61065 / US | 11 /
CALZADA, Manuel 103 Lilac Court Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | 12 /
EWALD, Henry, Thomas 338 Jennifer Lane Roselle, IL 60172 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
SANDS, Jeffrey L. 1940 W. Revere Freeport, IL 61032 / US | ||
02 /
PELLICANE, Jack 146 Lucinda Lane Wyomissing, PA 19610 / US | |||
03 /
CONLIN, James, D. 5655 Daniel Drive South Beloit, IL 61080 / US | |||
04 /
FRANKEN, Thomas, J. 11837 Bend River Road Roscoe, IL 61032 / US | |||
05 /
FRANKLIN, Andrew, Paul 2359 Kruse Drive Beloit, WI 53511 / US | |||
06 /
GINNER, Randy, L. 1152 E. Inman Parkway Beloit, WI 53511 / US | |||
07 /
GLAVAN, Ronald, J. 210 Countryside Drive Rockton, IL 61072 / US | |||
08 /
GLAWE, Scott, A. 11823 Wagon Lane Roscoe, IL 61073 / US | |||
09 /
HILL, David, A. 826 Garfield Avenue Beloit, WI 53511 / US | |||
10 /
NEWBERRY, Michael, J. 110 S.W. New Brunswick Lane Poplar Grove, IL 61065 / US | |||
11 /
CALZADA, Manuel 103 Lilac Court Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | |||
12 /
EWALD, Henry, Thomas 338 Jennifer Lane Roselle, IL 60172 / US | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/03] | Leckey, David H. Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03719822.3 | 16.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003US11963 | Priority number, date | US20020124754 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: US 124754 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088794 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496780 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496780 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/04 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A47J37/044 (EP,US);
A47J37/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [2005/03] | Title | German: | GRILLBAUELEMENT | [2005/03] | English: | GRILLING COMPONENT | [2005/03] | French: | ELEMENT GRIL | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 14.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0001285 (FKI FAST FOOD TEKNIK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-10 * pages 8-13; figure - * * page 9, lines 24-27 *; | [X]EP0655215 (BLODGETT G S CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 5, line 19 - column 8, line 29; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]US5588354 (STUCK ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 3, line 55 - column 8, line 29; figures 2,7 *; | [X]US4072092 (KOHLI MARTTI ILMARI, et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 8, line 15 - column 11, line 33; figures 7,8 *; | [X]US6112647 (BRUNNER KARL H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 18; figure 3 * |