EP1393155 - MONITORING AND DATA EXCHANGE METHOD OF AN EXTERNAL STORAGE MEDIUM UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freecom Technologies GmbH Obentrautstrasse 72-74 10963 Berlin / DE | [2004/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTS, Pieter Wallstrasse 9 10719 Berlin / DE | 02 /
RUSS, Carsten Walzelstrasse 3 13581 Berlin / DE | 03 /
LUCASSEN, Axel Hofeijckstraat 42 NL-2271 AM Voorburg / NL | 04 /
PERK, Herman Spessartstrasse 15 14197 Berlin / DE | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2004/10] | Bergmann, Simon Hertin Anwaltssozietät, Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03720152.2 | 04.03.2003 | [2004/10] | WO2003DE00746 | Priority number, date | DE2002109712 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10209712 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03075164 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1393155 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G06F13/4081 (EP,US);
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F3/0673 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND ZUM DATENAUSTAUSCH EINER EXTERNEN DATENTRÄGEREINHEIT | [2004/10] | English: | MONITORING AND DATA EXCHANGE METHOD OF AN EXTERNAL STORAGE MEDIUM UNIT | [2004/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE ET D'ECHANGE DE DONNEES D'UNE UNITE DE STOCKAGE DE DONNEES EXTERNE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/11] | Appeal following examination | 24.11.2005 | Appeal received No. T0657/06 | 01.02.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.11.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 14.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP07120353.3 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 11.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0127768 (CMS PERIPHERALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, line 27 - page 6, line 13 * * page 8, line 5 - line 13 *; | [A]US5758067 (MAKINEN BRUCE A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - line 63 * * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 54 * * figures 1,5 * |