EP1480896 - CONTAINER FOR DISTRIBUTOR OF LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/49] | FITTINGS FOR LIQUID FOODSTUFF, PARTICULARLY WATER, CONTAINERS | ||
[2006/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sources 77 51, rue de l'Obelisque 77610 Neufmoutiers en Brie / FR | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MABELLY, André 58 rue Pierre Quemeneur F-93150 LE BLANC MESNIL / FR | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Grynwald, Albert, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN 16, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Grynwald, Albert, et al Cabinet Grynwald 94, rue Saint Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/49] | Grynwald, Albert Thomson Multimedia, La Défense 5, 9, Place des Vosges 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 03720639.8 | 24.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003FR00590 | Priority number, date | FR20020002354 | 25.02.2002 Original published format: FR 0202354 | FR20020009898 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: FR 0209898 | [2004/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03072457 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480896 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480896 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
B65D77/06 (EP,US);
B65D83/0055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSSPENDER | [2006/27] | English: | CONTAINER FOR DISTRIBUTOR OF LIQUIDS | [2006/27] | French: | RESERVOIR POUR FONTAINE DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE | [2006/27] |
Former [2004/49] | ZUBEHÖR FÜR BEHÄLTER VON FLÜSSIGEN NAHRUNGSMITTEL INSBESONDERE WASSER | ||
Former [2004/49] | FITTINGS FOR LIQUID FOODSTUFF, PARTICULARLY WATER, CONTAINERS | ||
Former [2004/49] | ACCESSOIRES POUR CONTENEURS DE LIQUIDES ALIMENTAIRES NOTAMMENT D'EAU | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Request for further processing for: | 12.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2007 | CY | 03.01.2007 | CZ | 03.01.2007 | DK | 03.01.2007 | EE | 03.01.2007 | FI | 03.01.2007 | IE | 03.01.2007 | NL | 03.01.2007 | SI | 03.01.2007 | SK | 03.01.2007 | TR | 03.01.2007 | LU | 24.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | SE | 03.04.2007 | BG | 04.04.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
LU | 24.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 03.01.2007 | |
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2999500 (FRIEDRICH SCHURER) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]FR2094286 (ELUERE YVES) [X] 1,3,7-9 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,5,6,10-14; | [Y]DE8705463U (SCHOELLHAMMER LUTZ [DE]) [Y] 2,6,10-14 * page 4 - page 5; figure - *; | [A]US4875508 (BURKE II ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-23* column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 60; figures 1,2,6 * |