30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
01.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
23.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
31.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
31.07.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
15.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
08.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
03.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
22.08.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.05.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] |
15.06.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
15.06.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
06.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
26.11.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
22.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|