Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003224450 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2003 | A8 | AU2003224450 | 27.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT0300228 | 11.04.2003 | ITBS20020038 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1495260 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2008 | B1 | EP1495260 | 12.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT0300228 | 11.04.2003 | ITBS20020038 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60323742D1 | 06.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IT0300228 | 11.04.2003 | ITBS20020038 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03087666 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20020038 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE409305T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20020038 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2312768T | 01.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20020038 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITBS20020038 | 13.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20020038 | 12.04.2002 |