EP1498421 - GAMMA-SECRETASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mori, Hiroshi Room 301, Haitsu-kosumo-21, 3-45, Nakamichi 1-chome, Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 537-0025 / JP | [2009/46] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Mori, Hiroshi Room 301, Haitsu-kosumo-21, 3-45, Nakamichi 1-chome, Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 537-0025 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03720938.4 | 18.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP05017 | Priority number, date | JP20020121983 | 24.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002121983 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091278 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498421 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498421 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/00, C07K7/00, C07K16/44, C12N9/99 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C07K5/0207 (EP,US);
C07K5/00 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4711 (EP,US);
C07K14/8114 (EP,US);
C07K16/44 (KR);
C07K7/00 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GAMMA-SEKRETASE-INHIBITOREN | [2005/03] | English: | GAMMA-SECRETASE INHIBITORS | [2005/03] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE GAMMA SECRETASE | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2004 | Translation filed | 18.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.2009 | BE | 11.11.2009 | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | TR | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | ES | 22.02.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | IE | 18.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 18.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 18.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0153255 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002013276 (NADIN ALAN JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y] - SASTRE M ET AL, "Presenilin-dependent gamma-secretase processing of beta-amyloid precursor protein at a site corresponding to the S3 cleavage of Notch.", EMBO REPORTS. SEP 2001, (200109), vol. 2, no. 9, ISSN 1469-221X, pages 835 - 841, XP002373229 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/embo-reports/kve180 | [Y] - YU C ET AL, "Characterization of a presenilin-mediated amyloid precursor protein carboxyl-terminal fragment gamma. Evidence for distinct mechanisms involved in gamma -secretase processing of the APP and Notch1 transmembrane domains.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. 23 NOV 2001, (20011123), vol. 276, no. 47, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 43756 - 43760, XP002373230 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.C100410200 | International search | [A]EP0236734 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X] - GU Y. ET AL., "Distinct intramembrane cleavage of the beta-amyloid precursor protein family resembling gamma-secretase-like cleavage of Notch", J. BIOL. CHEM., (20010921), pages 35235 - 35238, XP002970044 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.C100357200 | [Y] - SHEARMAN M.S. ET AL., "L-685, 458, an aspartyl protease transition state mimic, is a potent inhibitor of amyloid beta-protein precursor gamma-secretase activity", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20000801), vol. 39, no. 30, pages 8698 - 8704, XP002164178 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi0005456 | [Y] - WOLFE M.S. ET AL., "A substrate-based difluoro ketone selectively inhibits Alzheimer's gamma-secretase activity", J. MED. CHEM., (19980101), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 6 - 9, XP000938942 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970621b | [Y] - SCHWARZE S.R. ET AL., "In vivo protein transduction: delivery of a biologically active protein into the mouse", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, pages 1569 - 1572, XP002140133 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.285.5433.1569 | [Y] - WEIDEMANN A. ET AL., "A novel epsilon-cleavage within the transmembrane domain of the Alzheimer amyloid precursor protein demonstrated homology with Notch processing", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20020226), vol. 41, no. 8, pages 2825 - 2835, XP002970045 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi015794o | [A] - PINNIX I. ET AL., "A novel gamma -secretase assay based on detection of the putative C-terminal fragment-gamma of amyloid beta protein precursor", J. BIOL. CHEM., (20010105), vol. 276, no. 1, pages 481 - 487, XP002217635 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M005968200 | [A] - FIGUEIREDO-PEREIRA M.E. ET AL., "Distinct secretases, a cysteine protease and a serine protease, generate the C termini of amyloid beta-proteins Abeta1-40 and Abeta1-42, respectively", J. NEUROCHEM., (199904), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 1417 - 1422, XP002970046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1471-4159.1999.721417.x | [A] - GHOSH A.K. ET AL., "Structure-based design: potent inhibitoirs of human brain memapsin 2. (beta-secretase)", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 44, no. 18, pages 2865 - 2868, XP002213861 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0101803 | [A] - CHONG K.T. ET AL., "Peptidomimetic HIV protease inhibitors: phosphate prodrugs with improved biological activities", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 36, no. 17, pages 2575 - 2577, XP002007120 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00069a018 | [A] - TIAN G. ET AL., "Linear non-competitive inhibition of solubilized human gamma-secretase by peptide A methylaster, L685458, sulfonamides and benzodiazepines", J. BIOL. CHEM., (20020830), vol. 277, no. 35, pages 31499 - 31505, XP002970047 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M112328200 |