Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7585938 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2009 | B2 | US2006205666 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101051249B | Global Dossier | 21.07.2011 | B1 | KR20040106370 | 17.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4404643B | Global Dossier | 27.01.2010 | B2 | JPWO2003091278 | 02.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003235283 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1498421 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2009 | B1 | EP1498421 | 17.05.2006 | A4 | EP1498421 | 19.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE448242T | 15.11.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0304562 | 20.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60329995D1 | 24.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO329184B | 06.09.2010 | B1 | NO20035535L | 19.02.2004 | L | NO20035535D0 | 11.12.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | JP0305017 | 18.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03091278 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1319987C | 06.06.2007 | C | CN1656115 | 17.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002121983 | 24.04.2002 |