EP1535757 - COMPOUND SOLID TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fukunaga Engineering Co., Ltd. 13-30, Shiginonishi 5-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Fukunaga Engineering Co., Ltd. 13-30, Shiginonishi 5-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUNAGA, Muneyasu 14-16, Shigino-Nishi 5-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-0014 / JP | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 03721042.4 | 07.05.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003JP05680 | Priority number, date | JP20020240507 | 21.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002240507 | [2005/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004018235 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535757 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60C7/00, B60C11/00, B60C11/02, B60C7/10 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
B60C11/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60C7/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60C11/00 (KR);
B60C7/101 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T152/10297 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10306 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | B60C7/00, B60C11/00, B60C11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDVOLLREIFEN | [2005/22] | English: | COMPOUND SOLID TIRE | [2005/22] | French: | PNEU PLEIN COMPOSITE | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2004 | Translation filed | 17.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 14.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2130535 (BERGOUGNAN BENELUX) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 37-47 * * page 2, lines 10-16 * * page 2, lines 45-47 * * page 3, lines 36-41 ** figures 1,4 * | International search | [Y]US3815651 (NEAL D); | [Y]JPS61229602 (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05154941 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]US5277727 (SEILER RONALD R [US], et al); | [Y]JPH07232508 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [Y]JPH1086609 (IKETANI TAKESHI); | [Y]US5837072 (FUKUNAGA MUNEYASU [JP]); | [Y]JPH10315347 (WATANABE RIYOUKICHI) |