EP1502376 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION TIMING IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGLUND, Eva Arbetaregatan 4A S-582 52 LINKÖPING / SE | 02 /
BARK, Gunnar Mariedalsgatan 104 S-586 65 LINKÖPING / SE | 03 /
WIBERG, Niclas Sofielundsvägen 8 S-585 97 LINKÖPING / SE | 04 /
GUNNARSSON, Fredrik Valkebogatan 12 S-582 47 LINKÖPING / SE | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Hägglund, Mats O. Ericsson AB Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Hägglund, Mats O. Ericsson AB, Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03721207.3 | 15.04.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003SE00612 | Priority number, date | US20020128583 | 24.04.2002 Original published format: US 128583 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03092210 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1502376 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1502376 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
H04L1/0021 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0006 (EP,US);
H04L1/0022 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFWÄRTSÜBERTRAGUNGSTAKT IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2005/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION TIMING IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2005/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SYNCHRONISATION DE TRANSMISSION MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | BE | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | IE | 15.04.2008 | LU | 15.04.2008 | CH | 30.04.2008 | LI | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | DE | 28.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 15.04.2008 | ||
LU | 15.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 15.04.2008 | ||
LU | 15.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 15.04.2008 | ||
LU | 15.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 15.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 15.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1063805 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 25,37 * column 2, paragraphs 6,7 * * column 3, paragraphs 9,10 * * column 5, line 33 - line 39 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 4 * * column 6, line 18 - line 31 * * column 8, line 12 - line 16 *; | [X]WO0103357 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8,16,25-32,37-39 * page 2, line 31 - line 36 * * page 3, line 8 - line 19 * * page 6, line 6 - line 15 * * page 6, line 15 - line 27 * * page 6, line 28 - line 38 * * page 8, line 26 - line 38 * * page 10, line 13 - line 30 * * page 13, line 25 - line 34 * * page 14, line 16 - line 23; figure 3 *; | [X]US2002022487 (AHN HEEJUNE [KR]) [X] 1-6,28,29,32 * page 1, column R, paragraphs 14-16 * * page 2, column L, paragraphs 25,26 * * page 4, column L, paragraphs 70,73,74 * * page 4, column R, paragraphs 75,81,87 * * page 5, column L, paragraph 88; figure 3 *; | [A] - WATANABE S ET AL, "BIT ERROR RATE EVALUATION OF DELAY TIME CONTROL SCHEME FOR REVERSE CHANNEL ON ORTHOGONAL CODING MULTI-CARRIER CDMA", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (199707), vol. E80-A, no. 7, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 1226 - 1232, XP000996928 [A] 1,16,25,28,37 * page 1229, column L, line 19 - line 36 * * page 1229, column R, line 5 - page 1230, column L, line 7; figures 6,7 * |