EP1478431 - ELECTRICAL METHOD TO CONTROL AUTONOMIC NERVE STIMULATION OF GASTROINTESTING TRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurosignal Technologies, Inc 539 Oliver Ross Drive NW Albuquerque NM 87121 / US | [2008/10] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Science Medicus, Inc. 4790 Caughlin Parkway No. 525 Reno, NV 89509 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULER, Eleanor 2201 Spruce Needle Road Rio Rancho, NM 87124 / US | 02 /
LEE, Claude, K. 4870 East Creek Ridge Trail Reno, NV 89509 / US | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2004/48] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03721314.7 | 25.02.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003US06045 | Priority number, date | US20020085386 | 28.02.2002 Original published format: US 85386 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074123 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478431 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
A61N1/36007 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/0404 (KR);
A61N1/08 (KR);
A61N1/36031 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE DER AUTONOMEN NERVENSTIMULATION DES MAGEN-DARM-KANALS | [2004/48] | English: | ELECTRICAL METHOD TO CONTROL AUTONOMIC NERVE STIMULATION OF GASTROINTESTING TRACT | [2004/48] | French: | PROCEDE ELECTRIQUE PERMETTANT DE REGULER LA STIMULATION DU SYSTEME NERVEUX AUTONOME DU TUBE DIGESTIF | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 01.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0155815 (BIO MEDICAL RES LTD [IE]) [X] 5-10 * abstract * * figure 11A *; | [X]US4598713 (HANSJUERGENS ACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 5 * abstract *; | [X]US4699143 (DUFRESNE JOEL R [US], et al) [X] 5-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4832033 (MAHER DANIEL V [US], et al) [X] 5-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0391428 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP], et al) [X] 5 * the whole document *; | [X]CH686557 (HOSPITECH PHYSICOM CLINICHEM G [AT]) [X] 5-10 * abstract * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 18 * * column 8, lines 19-62 *; | [X]EP0860178 (SIRE S R L [IT]) [X] 5-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5891182 (FLEMING JANET E [US]) [X] 5-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 61 - column 7, line 18 * * column 24, lines 13-53 *; | [E]WO03045496 (SCIENCE MEDICUS INC [US], et al) [E] 5-10* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6238423 (BARDY GUST H [US]) |