EP1483684 - METHOD OF PERFORMING NXM DISCRETE COSINE TRANSFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHELTOV, Sergey Intel A/O 30 Turgenev Street Nizhny Novgorod, 603950 / RU | 02 /
BRATANOV, Stanislav Intel A/O 30 Turgenev Street Nizhny Novgorod, 603950 / RU | 03 /
BELENOV, Roman 21 Pushkin Street, 8 Nizhny Novgorod, 603098 / RU | 04 /
KNYAZEV, Alexander Intel A/O 30 Turgenev Street Nizhny Novgorod, 603950 / RU | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03721367.5 | 11.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003US07693 | Priority number, date | US20020096987 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: US 96987 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03079218 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1483684 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/14 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G06F17/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER NXM DISKRETEN COSINUS-TRANSFORMATION | [2004/50] | English: | METHOD OF PERFORMING NXM DISCRETE COSINE TRANSFORM | [2004/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE TRANSFORMEE EN COSINUS DISCRETE NXM | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 24.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/08] | 09.10.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - TRAN T D, "The binDCT: fast multiplierless approximation of the DCT", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESS. LETT. (USA), IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, JUNE 2000, IEEE, USA, (200006), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1070-9908, pages 141 - 144, XP002283566 [A] 1-24 * page 141, column L, line 18 - page 143, column L, line 2 * * page 143, column L, line 10 - page 144, column L, line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/97.844633 | [A] - JIE LIANG ET AL, "Approximating the DCT with the lifting scheme: systematic design and applications", 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, (2000), ISBN 0-7803-6514-3, pages 192 - 196 vol.1, XP002283567 [A] 1-24 * page 192, column L, line 14 - column R, line 7 * * page 193, column L, line 12 - page 194, column R, line 4 * * page 194, column R, line 28 - page 196, column R, line 5 * | [A] - SEEHYUN KIM ET AL, "Fixed-point optimization utility for C and C++ based digital signal processing programs", IEEE TRANS. CIRCUITS SYST. II, ANALOG DIGIT. SIGNAL PROCESS. (USA), IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: ANALOG AND DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, NOV. 1998, IEEE, USA, (199811), vol. 45, no. 11, ISSN 1057-7130, pages 1455 - 1464, XP002283568 [A] 1-24 * page 1455, column L, line 23 - page 1456, column L, line 35 * * page 1459, column L, line 15 - page 1461, column L, line 47 * * page 1461, column L, line 54 - page 1463, column L, line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/82.735357 | [A] - AKRAMULLAH S M ET AL, "Optimization of H.263 video encoding using a single processor computer: performance tradeoffs and benchmarking", IEEE TRANS. CIRCUITS SYST. VIDEO TECHNOL. (USA), IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, AUG. 2001, IEEE, USA, (200108), vol. 11, no. 8, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 901 - 915, XP002283569 [A] 1-24 * page 901, column R, line 33 - page 902, column L, line 5 * * page 903, column R, line 51 - page 904, column L, line 16 * * page 904, column R, line 29 - page 905, column R, line 14 * * page 906, column L, line 52 - column R, line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.937424 |