EP1504139 - CONVERSION COATINGS INCLUDING ALKALINE EARTH METAL FLUORIDE COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2005/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENE, Jeffrey Allen 26526 Ada Drive Warren, MI 48091 / US | 02 /
VONK, Donald Robb 21331 North Nunneley Clinton Township, MI 48036 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03721923.5 | 29.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US13258 | Priority number, date | US20020134761 | 29.04.2002 Original published format: US 134761 | US20020435441P | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 435441 P | US20030424302 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: US 424302 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03093532 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1504139 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504139 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/34, C23C22/73 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
C23C22/83 (EP,US);
C23C22/34 (EP,KR,US);
C23C22/73 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/12535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/34] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMWANDLUNGSÜBERZÜGE, ERDALKALI-FLUORIDKOMPLEXE ENTHALTEND | [2005/06] | English: | CONVERSION COATINGS INCLUDING ALKALINE EARTH METAL FLUORIDE COMPLEXES | [2005/06] | French: | REVETEMENTS DE CONVERSION COMPRENANT DES COMPLEXES ALCALINO-TERREUX DE FLUORURE METALLIQUE | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO8505141 (AULIS LUNDELL OY [FI]) [X] 1,5-12,15,26,28 * page 3, line 17 - page 6, line 23; examples 6,11,12; claims 1-6,12-16 * [Y] 13,14; | [X]DE10022657 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [X] 1,6,8-11,15,26,27 * figure 14; example 6 *; | [X]US3160506 (O'CONNOR GERALD F, et al) [X] 16 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 5 *; | [Y]WO9946422 (NATURAL COATING SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * page 9, lines 11-24 * * page 13, line 11 - page 14, line 7 *; | [PX]WO03018872 (MACDERMID INC [US]) [PX] 1,6-12,15,26,28 * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 10; examples 3,10; claims 1,5,6,9,10,13,14,18,21,24,25,28 * |