EP1504456 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MRAM OFFSET CELLS IN A DOUBLE DAMASCENE STRUCTURE WITH A REDUCED NUMBER OF ETCH STEPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2005/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NING, Xian, J. 3872 Marcy Street Mohegan Lake, NY 10547 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03722378.1 | 01.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003EP03394 | Priority number, date | US20020146976 | 16.05.2002 Original published format: US 146976 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098635 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504456 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/15, G11C11/16 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H10B61/00 (EP);
H01L27/105 (KR);
G11C11/15 (US);
H10N50/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2005/06] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VERSETZTER MRAM ZELLEN IN EINEM DOPPEL-DAMASZENER PROZESS MIT REDUZIERTER ANZAHL VON ÄTZSCHRITTEN | [2005/06] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MRAM OFFSET CELLS IN A DOUBLE DAMASCENE STRUCTURE WITH A REDUCED NUMBER OF ETCH STEPS | [2005/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELLULES A DECALAGE MRAM DANS UNE STRUCTURE DAMASQUINEE, AVEC UN NOMBRE REDUIT D'ETAPES DE GRAVURE | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 26.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1054449 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [Y]US6174737 (DURLAM MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US6350674 (OKAMURA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]DE10043159 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) |