EP1493003 - LEVEL MEASUREMENT DEVICE HAVING ELECTRONICS AND ANTENNA IN ONE HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstrasse 1-5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Vega Grieshaber KG Haupstrasse 1-5 77709 Wolfach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEHRENBACH, Josef Schlattstrasse 1 77716 Haslach / DE | 02 /
MOTZER, Jürgen Bergach 17 77723 Gengenbach / DE | 03 /
SCHULTHEISS, Daniel Reichenbaccherstrasse 37 78132 Hornberg / DE | 04 /
GRIESSBAUM, Karl Hauptstrasse 32 77796 Mühlenbach / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Preuss, Udo Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Preuss, Udo Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Preuss, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03722436.7 | 09.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003EP03695 | Priority number, date | US20020371990P | 10.04.2002 Original published format: US 371990 P | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03085365 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493003 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493003 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284, G01S7/03, H01Q1/22 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G01S7/032 (EP,US);
G01F23/284 (EP,US);
H01Q1/225 (EP,US);
G01S7/027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | G01F23/284 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2017/23] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜLLSTANDSMESSVORRICHTUNG MIT ELEKTRONIK UND ANTENNE IN EINEM GEHÄUSE | [2005/01] | English: | LEVEL MEASUREMENT DEVICE HAVING ELECTRONICS AND ANTENNA IN ONE HOUSING | [2005/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE DE NIVEAU RENFERMANT UN CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET UNE ANTENNE DANS UN SEUL BOÎTIER | [2016/48] |
Former [2005/01] | APPAREIL DE MESURE DE NIVEAU RENFERMANT DE L'EQUIPEMENT ELECTRONIQUE ET UNE ANTENNE DANS UN BOITIER | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16205531.3 / EP3159663 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 07.06.2017 | [2018/01] | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0884567 (SAILER JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,12,17,20-23 * column 2, line 48 - column 5, line 52; figures 1,4 * [A] 7-9; | [XA]US4205315 (FLEENOR RICHARD P [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,18-21 * the whole document * [A] 7-13,17,22,23; | [XA]US4566321 (ZACCHIO JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,22-24 | Examination | US5507181 | US5703289 | US5926152 | US5926080 | by applicant | US5507181 | US5703289 | US5926152 | US5926080 |