Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003229854 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0300685 | 04.03.2003 | FR0202780 | 05.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1480863 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2006 | B1 | EP1480863 | 01.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0300685 | 04.03.2003 | FR0202780 | 05.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60303665T | 14.12.2006 | T2 | DE60303665D1 | 27.04.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0300685 | 04.03.2003 | FR0202780 | 05.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03074339 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0202780 | 05.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE318231T | 15.03.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0202780 | 05.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2836884 | 28.05.2004 | B1 | FR2836884 | 12.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0202780 | 05.03.2002 |