EP1487970 - TOLEROGENIC ANTIGEN-PRESENTING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revivicor Inc. 1700 Kraft Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Marilyn, Jean PPL Therapeutics, Roslin Edinburgh EH25 9PP / GB | 02 /
LEISHMAN, Andrew, James PPL Therapeutics, Roslin Edinburgh EH25 9PP / GB | 03 /
INNES, Donald, Alan, James PPL Therapeutics, Roslin Edinburgh EH25 9PP / GB | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03722708.9 | 27.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003GB01355 | Priority number, date | GB20020007440 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0207440 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03083089 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1487970 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, A61K35/00 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C12N5/064 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP);
A61K39/4621 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/46433 (EP);
A61K39/464411 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61K2035/122 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | 29.09.2004 | LT | 29.09.2004 | LV | 29.09.2004 | MK | 29.09.2004 | Title | German: | TOLEROGENE ANTIGENPRÄSENTIERENDE ZELLEN | [2004/52] | English: | TOLEROGENIC ANTIGEN-PRESENTING CELLS | [2004/52] | French: | CELLULES TOLEROGENES PRESENTANT DES ANTIGENES | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6224859 (THOMSON ANGUS W [US], et al) [X] 1-7,16-25 *whole document: in particular abstract, example 2 and claims*; | [XD]WO0183713 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]) [XD] 1-7,16-25 *whole document: in particular abstract and claims*; | [XD]US2002019047 (WALDMANN HERMAN [GB], et al) [XD] 1-7,16-25*whole document: in particular abstract and claims*; | [XD] - LIANG X ET AL, "PHENOTYPE AND ALLOSTIMULATORY FUNCTION OF DENDRITIC CELLS TREATED WITH ANTISENSE OLIGODEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDES TARGETING CD80 OR CD86 MRNA", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (200102), vol. 33, no. 1/2, ISSN 0041-1345, page 235, XP001036750 [XD] 1-7,16-25 *whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0041-1345(00)01991-6 | [X] - JONULEIT H ET AL, "Dendritic cells as a tool to induce anergic and regulatory T cells", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20010701), vol. 22, no. 7, ISSN 1471-4906, pages 394 - 400, XP004247295 [X] 1-7,16-25 *whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4906(01)01952-4 | [X] - FAIRCHILD P J ET AL, "Directed differentiation of dendritic cells from mouse embryonic stem cells", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE,, GB, (20001130), vol. 10, no. 23, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 1515 - 1518, XP001104013 [X] 1-7,16-25 *whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(00)00824-1 |