EP1490398 - TUMOUR ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown, Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 7BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Isis Innovation Limited Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown, Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 7BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANHAM, Alison, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501 John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | 02 /
PULFORD, Karen, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501 John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | 03 /
ANDERSON, Amanda, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501 John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | 04 /
GUINN, Barbara, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501 John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | [2011/36] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
BANHAM, Alison, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501, John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | ||
02 /
PULFORD, Karen, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501, John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | |||
03 /
LIGGINS, Amanda, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501, John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | |||
04 /
GUINN, Barbara, Nuffield Dept Clinical Lab. Sci. Level 5, Room 5501, John Radcliffe Hospital Headington, Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03722712.1 | 27.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003GB01378 | Priority number, date | GB20020007251 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0207251 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03082916 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1490398 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490398 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/4722 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | TUMOR ASSOZIIERTE ANTIGENE | [2005/01] | English: | TUMOUR ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS | [2005/01] | French: | ANTIGENES ASSOCIES A UNE TUMEUR | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2003 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | LU | 27.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
LU | 27.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5922566 (BANDMAN OLGA [US], et al); | [X]WO0162917 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]); | [PX]WO03011902 (KENTON S R L [IT], et al); |