EP1490071 - THERAPEUTIC USES OF SAPOGENINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | THERAPUTIC METHODS AND USES OF SAPOGENINS AND THEIR DERIVATIVES | ||
[2008/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHYTOPHARM PLC Corpus Christi House, 9 West Street Godmanchester Cambridgeshire PE18 2HY / GB | [2009/10] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Phytopharm Plc Corpus Christi House, 9 West Street Godmanchester, Cambridgeshire PE18 2HY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REES, Daryl 9,West Street Godmanchester, Cambridgeshire PE29 2HY / GB | 02 /
GUNNING, Phil 9,West Street Godmanchester, Cambridgeshire PE29 2HY / GB | 03 /
ORSI, Antonia 9,West Street Godmanchester, Cambridgeshire PE29 2HY / GB | 04 /
XIA, Zongqin Flat 403, Block 8 1, Jian-De Road Shanghai 200025 / CN | 05 /
HU, Yaer Flat 1209, Block1, Lane 357, MaDang Road Shanghai 200025 / CN | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Brown, David Leslie HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03722713.9 | 27.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003GB01380 | Priority number, date | AR2002P101170 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: AR P020101170 | US20020368178P | 28.03.2002 Original published format: US 368178 P | WO2002GB01578 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: PCT/GB02/01578 | [2009/09] |
Former [2005/01] | AR20010001170 | 27.03.2002 | |
US20020368178P | 28.03.2002 | ||
WO2002GB01578 | 28.03.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03082893 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1490071 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490071 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/585, A61P9/02, A61P9/04, A61P11/06, A61P21/00, A61P21/04, A61P25/08, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P27/00 | [2005/01] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | 22.12.2004 | LT | 22.12.2004 | LV | 22.12.2004 | MK | 22.12.2004 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG VON SAPOGENINEN | [2008/28] | English: | THERAPEUTIC USES OF SAPOGENINS | [2008/28] | French: | UTILISATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES DES SAPOGENINES | [2008/28] |
Former [2005/01] | THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG VON SAPOGENINEN UND DEREN DERIVATE | ||
Former [2005/01] | THERAPUTIC METHODS AND USES OF SAPOGENINS AND THEIR DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2005/01] | METHODES THERAPEUTIQUES ET UTILISATIONS DES SAPOGENINES ET DE LEURS DERIVES | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09154213.4 / EP2111864 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.03.2009 | CZ | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | EE | 04.03.2009 | RO | 04.03.2009 | SI | 04.03.2009 | SK | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | BG | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | HU | 05.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
HU | 05.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | SI | 04.03.2009 | |
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | SI | 04.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05246866 ; | [X]JP2002030096 ; | [A]JPH092957 ; | [A]JPH092956 ; | [X]EP0162330 (ROECAR HOLDINGS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * claim 3 *; | [X]US4680289 (APPLEZWEIG NORMAN [US]) [X] 5 * tables I,II * * claims 16,18,19 *; | [XD]DE4303214 (MARKS WOLFGANG [DE]) [XD] 1-8 * page 6, line 15 - line 26 * * page 7, line 10 - line 15 * * claims 1-3,7,14 *; | [A]EP0659762 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 108, line 23 - line 36 * * claims 1,3,27 *; | [A]WO9802450 (INFLAZYME PHARM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-8 * example 25 * * page 178, line 9 - line 10 * * claims 27,29 *; | [XD]WO9948507 (PHYTOPHARM PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1-8 * page 1, line 5 - line 24 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 4 * * page 9, line 5 - line 13 * * page 10, line 4 - line 11 * * page 15, line 9 - page 16, line 3 * * page 23, line 23 - page 24, line 8 * * claims 1-32 *; | [X]EP1024146 (INST RADIATION MED AMMS PLA [CN]) [X] 1-7 * page 19, line 11 - line 12 * * page 33, line 46 - page 34, line 27 * * claims 1,3-20 *; | [XD]WO0123406 (PHYTOPHARM PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1-8 * page 1, line 4 - line 33 * * page 6, line 17 - page 9, line 17 * * page 13, line 4 - line 23 * * page 13, line 28 - line 30 * * page 15 - page 19; table 1 * * claims 1-15 *; | [XD]WO0123408 (PHYTOPHARM PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1-8 * page 1, line 4 - line 22 * * page 6, line 16 - page 9, line 17 * * page 12, line 16 - line 24 * * page 13, line 16 - page 14, line 27 * * claims 1-13 *; | [X]WO0123407 (PHYTOPHARM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 32 * * claims 1-5,8,14 *; | [X]WO0149703 (PHYTOPHARM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 1 - line 22 * * page 7, line 11 - page 15, line 4 * * page 15, line 6 - page 16, line 24 * * page 22, line 32 - line 34 * * page 23, line 3 - line 35 * * claims 1-20,22,26,28,29 *; | [E]WO03077869 (SAMARITAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [E] 1,2,4-8 * figure 1 * * page 5, line 14 - line 21 ** claims 1-8,10-14 *; | [X] - SUN, HUI ET AL, "Retinal stimulates ATP hydrolysis by purified and reconstituted ABCR, the photoreceptor-specific ATP-binding cassette transporter responsible for Stargardt disease", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY (1999), 274(12), 8269-8281, XP001165795 [X] 1-3,5,8 * figures 2,3,9,10 * * page 8280, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.12.8269 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 43, Database accession no. 1993-339641, XP002157713 & JPH05246866 A 19930924 (KATO K) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002030096 A 20020129 (KYORIN PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09002957 A 19970107 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09002956 A 19970107 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - INOUE K ET AL, "Cholestanol induces apoptosis of cerebellar neuronal cells.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS. UNITED STATES 5 MAR 1999, (19990305), vol. 256, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 198 - 203, XP001188107 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.9497 | [A] - KYOUNG SOOK KIM, ET AL., "Effects of cholestanol feeding on corneal dystrophy in mice.", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1991), vol. 1085, pages 343 - 349, XP008027217 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | - NICOLAUS B.J.R., Decision Making in Drug Research, NEW YORK, USA, RAVEN PRESS, (1983) * "Symbiotic Approach to Drug Design"; page 173 - page 186 * |