EP1508247 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISTRIBUTED SIGNALING FOR UPLINK RATE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures I LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures I LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE, Building 4 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Spyder Navigations L.L.C. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOSKALA, Antti Mankkaanrinne 2 C FIN-02180 Espoo / FI | 02 /
MALKAMÄKI, Esa Riippakoivuntie 17 B FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | 03 /
HAO, Guan@Cheng Guang Jia Yuan east 218 1704 Chao Yang district 100025 Beijing / CN | 04 /
RINNE, Mikko, J. Tallbergin puistotie 1 C 25 FIN-00200 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
DERRYBERRY, R. Thomas 2620 Oak Grove Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | [2017/25] |
Former [2005/08] | 01 /
TOSKALA, Antti Mankkaanrinne 2 C FIN-02180 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
MALKAMÄKI, Esa Riippakoivuntie 17 B FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | |||
03 /
HAO, Guan Cheng Guang Jia Yuan east 218 1704 Chao Yang district 100025 Beijing / CN | |||
04 /
RINNE, Mikko, J. Tallbergin puistotie 1 C 25 FIN-00200 Helsinki / FI | |||
05 /
DERRYBERRY, R. Thomas 2620 Oak Grove Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/25] |
Former [2010/31] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03722922.6 | 13.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003IB01863 | Priority number, date | US20020156751 | 24.05.2002 Original published format: US 156751 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03100989 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1508247 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508247 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/22, H04W52/16, H04W92/10 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H04W28/22 (EP,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,US);
H04W52/20 (EP,US);
H04W52/225 (EP,US);
H04W92/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | H04Q7/00, H04Q7/20, H04J3/16, H04J3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERTEILTEN ZEICHENGABE FÜR DIE AUFWÄRTSSTRECKENRATENSTEUERUNG | [2005/08] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISTRIBUTED SIGNALING FOR UPLINK RATE CONTROL | [2005/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SIGNALISATION REPARTIE POUR LA COMMANDE DE VITESSE DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2017/03] |
Former [2005/08] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SIGNALISATION REPARTIE POUR LA COMMANDE DE VITESSE DE LIAISON MONTANTE | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 14.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 05.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2003 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 13.05.2003 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NOKIA, "Two Threshold Node B Packet Scheduling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-030060, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020107), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Diego, USA; 20030103, XP050097188 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | [X] - NOKIA, "Two Threshold Node B Packet Scheduling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-030129_2-THRESHOLD, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020221), vol. RAN WG1, no. Tokio, XP050097241 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | [X] - NOKIA, "Node B Controlled Scheduling by Fast TFCS Restriction Control", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-030181, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020218), vol. RAN WG1, no. Tokyo; 20030213, XP050097318 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6307867 (ROOBOL CHRISTIAAN [SE], et al); | [YP]US2003156580 (ABRAHAM SANTOSH P [US], et al); | [Y]US2001036823 (VAN LIESHOUT GERT-JAN [NL], et al); | [AP]US2002151310 (CHUNG SAE-YOUNG [US], et al) |