Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7095648 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2006 | B2 | US2006062067 | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02077000 | 22.05.2002 | IB0302019 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050004160 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02077000 | 22.05.2002 | IB0302019 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006501587 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02077000 | 22.05.2002 | IB0302019 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003230126 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02077000 | 22.05.2002 | IB0302019 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1573742 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02077000 | 22.05.2002 | IB0302019 | 16.05.2003 | EP03722969 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03098634 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2005 | A3 | WO03098634 | 27.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02077000 | 22.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200404308 | 16.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02077000 | 22.05.2002 |