EP1514226 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYSIS OF DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnolia Medical Technologies Ltd. Nolton House, 14 Shenkar Street 46725 Herzelia / IL | [2005/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINSTEIN, Doron 12 Openhiemer Street 69395 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
GORDON, Barak 25 Dubnov Street 75205 Rishon LeZion / IL | 03 /
GORDON, Goren 25 Dubnov Street 75205 Rishon LeZion / IL | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Malamis, Alkisti-Irene Malamis & Associates Attorneys at Law 8 Palaia Tatoiou Street 146 71 Kifissia / GR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Malamis, Alkisti-Irene Malamis & Malamis Attorneys at Law 52 Skoufa Street 106 72 Athens / GR | Application number, filing date | 03723018.2 | 13.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003IL00386 | Priority number, date | US20020145574 | 13.05.2002 Original published format: US 145574 | US20020145575 | 13.05.2002 Original published format: US 145575 | US20020152367 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: US 152367 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03096262 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1514226 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP);
G06T7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON DATEN | [2005/11] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYSIS OF DATA | [2005/11] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE DE DONNEES | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/22] | Request for further processing for: | 09.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2007 | Decision despatched | 08.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5878746 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-23,28-33 * column 1, line 66 - column 9, line 15; figures 1,2,4; claim 1 * * figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2002028006 (NOVAK CAROL L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-23,28-33 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0079]; figures 5,6 * | International search | [Y]US6022315 ; | [Y]US5235510 ; | [A]US5832488 ; | [A]US5836877 ; | [A]US5452416 ; | [A]US6006191 |