EP1496990 - INSTRUMENT WITH ACTIVE RADIO-FREQUENCY WIRES FOR TREATMENT OF TUMOURS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/03] | INSTRUMENT WITH AT LEAST TWO ACTIVE RADIO-FREQUENCY WIRES FOR TREATMENT OF TUMOURS | ||
[2010/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOGAZZI DI VENTURELLI ANDREA & C. S.N.C. Via L. Marenzio, 7 Loc. Roncaglie 25062 Concesio (Brescia) / IT | [2010/48] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states FOGAZZI DI VENTURELLI ANDREA & C. S.N.C. Via L. Marenzio, 7 Loc. Roncaglie 25062 Concesio (Brescia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENTURELLI, Andrea Via L. Marenzio, 7, Loc. Roncaglie I-25062 Concesio, BRESCIA / IT | [2010/43] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
VENTURELLI, Andrea Via L. Marenzio, 7, Loc. Roncaglie I-25062 Concesio / IT | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03723074.5 | 18.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003IT00250 | Priority number, date | IT2002BS00046U | 23.04.2002 Original published format: IT BS20020046 U | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090864 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496990 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496990 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/00, A61N1/06, A61N5/04, A61B18/14 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP);
A61N1/06 (EP);
A61B2018/1435 (EP);
A61B2018/1467 (EP);
A61B2018/1475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT MIT AKTIVEN RADIOFREQUENZ-DRÄHTEN ZUR TUMORBEHANDLUNG | [2010/24] | English: | INSTRUMENT WITH ACTIVE RADIO-FREQUENCY WIRES FOR TREATMENT OF TUMOURS | [2010/24] | French: | INSTRUMENT COMPORTANT DES FILS A FREQUENCE RADIO ACTIVE POUR TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS | [2010/24] |
Former [2005/03] | GERÄT MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI AKTIVEN RADIOFREQUENZ-DRÄHTEN ZUR TUMORBEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2005/03] | INSTRUMENT WITH AT LEAST TWO ACTIVE RADIO-FREQUENCY WIRES FOR TREATMENT OF TUMOURS | ||
Former [2005/03] | INSTRUMENT COMPORTANT AU MOINS DEUX FILS A FREQUENCE RADIO ACTIVE POUR TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | GB | 18.04.2011 | LU | 18.04.2011 | HU | 19.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
GB | 18.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
HU | 19.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
GB | 18.04.2011 | ||
HU | 19.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
HU | 19.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5800494 (CAMPBELL THOMAS H [US], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [X]EP0861676 (MEDTRONIC CARDIORHYTHM [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 6, line 17 - column 12, line 7; figures 1,2,8A; claim 1 *; | [X]US5993462 (POMERANZ MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 60; figures 1,,3A,,5A; claim 1 * | by applicant | US5431649 | US5672174 | EP0861676 |