EP1501610 - A GYMNASTIC MACHINE AND METHODS FOR USING IT, FOR TRAINING OF THE MUSCLES AND JOINTS OF THE HUMAN BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/05] | A GYMNASTIC MACHINE AND METHODS FOR USING IT, FOR TRAINING AND/OR REHABILITATION OF THE MUSCLES AND JOINTS OF THE HUMAN BODY | ||
[2008/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisa, Mohamed Bahaa El Din Via Carlo Bini 14 50134 Firenze / IT | [2005/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 03723083.6 | 24.04.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003IT00259 | Priority number, date | IT2002FI00073 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: IT FI20020073 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03092822 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1501610 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1501610 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/00, A63B23/035 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
A63B21/00181 (EP,US);
A63B21/0628 (EP,US);
A63B21/285 (EP,US);
A63B21/005 (EP,US);
A63B21/008 (EP,US);
A63B21/02 (EP,US);
A63B2225/102 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN GYMNASTIKGERÄT ZUM TRAINIEREN DER MUSKELN UND GELENKE DES MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERS, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN GEBRAUCH | [2008/16] | English: | A GYMNASTIC MACHINE AND METHODS FOR USING IT, FOR TRAINING OF THE MUSCLES AND JOINTS OF THE HUMAN BODY | [2008/16] | French: | MACHINE DE GYMNASTIQUE ET SES PROCEDES D'UTILISATION A DES FINS D'ENTRAINEMENT MUSCULAIRE ET ARTICULAIRE DU CORPS HUMAIN | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/05] | EIN GYMNASTIKGERÄT ZUM TRAINIEREN UND/ODER ZUR REHABILITATION DER MUSKELN UND GELENKE DES MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERS, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN GEBRAUCH | ||
Former [2005/05] | A GYMNASTIC MACHINE AND METHODS FOR USING IT, FOR TRAINING AND/OR REHABILITATION OF THE MUSCLES AND JOINTS OF THE HUMAN BODY | ||
Former [2005/05] | MACHINE DE GYMNASTIQUE ET SES PROCEDES D'UTILISATION A DES FINS D'ENTRAINEMENT ET/OU DE REEDUCATION MUSCULAIRE ET ARTICULAIRE DU CORPS HUMAIN | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2009 | BE | 21.01.2009 | CY | 21.01.2009 | CZ | 21.01.2009 | DK | 21.01.2009 | EE | 21.01.2009 | FI | 21.01.2009 | IT | 21.01.2009 | NL | 21.01.2009 | RO | 21.01.2009 | SI | 21.01.2009 | SK | 21.01.2009 | TR | 21.01.2009 | BG | 21.04.2009 | SE | 21.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | IE | 24.04.2009 | LU | 24.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | ES | 02.05.2009 | PT | 22.06.2009 | HU | 22.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
LU | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
HU | 22.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
LU | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 21.01.2009 | |
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 21.01.2009 | |
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 21.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2782033 (ENRIQUE UGARTECHEA) [X] 1,3,6 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 11 - line 43 * [Y] 4,5; | [XY]DE4107065 (REITINGER KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 5,7,8 * * column 3, line 50 - line 62 * [Y] 4,5; | [X]US5810379 (SHUSTERMAN G TODD [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1161968 (PIXELPARK AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * figure SINGLE * * paragraph [0028] * [Y] 5; | [Y]US2002004439 (GALBRAITH RICHARD SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 4,5* paragraph [0042] * |