EP1501718 - HULL FOR SHIPPING WITH A COMBINED MONO HULL- CATAMARAN ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mascellaro, Luigi Via Fosso della Castelluccia, 146/22 00134 Roma / IT | [2005/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/05] | Application number, filing date | 03723089.3 | 06.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003IT00271 | Priority number, date | IT2002RM00251 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: IT RM20020251 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095296 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1501718 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1501718 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/04 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
B63B1/20 (EP,US);
B63B2001/201 (EP,US);
B63B2001/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RUMPF ZUR SCHIFFFAHRT MIT EINER KOMBINIERTEN MONO-RUMPF-KATAMARAN -ARCHITEKTUR | [2005/05] | English: | HULL FOR SHIPPING WITH A COMBINED MONO HULL- CATAMARAN ARCHITECTURE | [2005/05] | French: | COQUE DE NAVIGATION A ARCHITECTURE MONO-CATAMARAN | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | RO | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | HU | 28.03.2007 | LU | 06.05.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
LU | 06.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | BG | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE872018 (JASTRAM HANS) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US3702598 (SZPTYMAN JACK J) [X] 1-6 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]US3885514 (LAUENBORG JAN TRONJE) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2295868 (SERVE YVAN [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 3-11 *; | [X]FR2635497 (PIANA GEORGES [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4924797 (SOLIA FRANCO [IT]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]US5402743 (HOLDERMAN JIM D [US]) [X] 1-6* figures 1-19 *; | [X]US6138602 (CARY ELTON MIKELL [US]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | WO9957006 |