EP1498621 - Pinion shaft with supporting bearing device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/03] | DOUBLE-ROW BALL BEARING AND BEARING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PINION SHAFT | ||
[2007/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Toshiro c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Hideo c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 03 /
KAWAGUCHI, Toshihiro c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 04 /
YOKOTA, Kunihiko c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 05 /
KAWAMURA, Motoshi c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 06 /
AKIYAMA, Muneyasu c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 07 /
NAKASHITA, Tomonori c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03723138.8 | 17.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP04907 | Priority number, date | JP20020117091 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002117091 | JP20020356933 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002356933 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03089798 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498621 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498621 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/18, F16C19/54, F16H1/04 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
F16H57/021 (EP,US);
F16C19/182 (EP,US);
F16C19/548 (EP,US);
F16H57/037 (EP,US);
F16H57/0421 (EP,US);
F16H57/0483 (EP,US);
F16C2240/46 (EP,US);
F16C2361/61 (EP,US);
F16C41/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/36] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ritzelwelle mit entsprechend abstützender Lagervorrichtung | [2007/13] | English: | Pinion shaft with supporting bearing device therefor | [2007/13] | French: | Arbre de pignon avec dispositif d'appui à palier | [2007/13] |
Former [2005/03] | ZWEIREIHIGES KUGELLAGER UND LAGERVORRICHTUNG ZUM STÜTZEN EINER RITZELWELLE | ||
Former [2005/03] | DOUBLE-ROW BALL BEARING AND BEARING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PINION SHAFT | ||
Former [2005/03] | PALIER A DOUBLE RANGEE DE BILLES ET DISPOSITIF D'APPUI POUR SOUTENIR UN ARBRE-PIGNON | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2004 | Translation filed | 15.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9317251 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]); | [A]JPH0566327U ; | [A]DE19839481 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) |