EP1512700 - POLYMERIZATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIKEN 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states RIKEN 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAITA, Shojiro C/O RIKEN, 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 02 /
HOU, Zhaomin C/O RIKEN, 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 03 /
WAKATSUKI, Yasuo C/O RIKEN, 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 04 /
DOI, Yoshiharu C/O RIKEN, 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/10] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03723266.7 | 08.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003JP05774 | Priority number, date | JP20020132993 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002132993 | JP20030024347 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003024347 | [2005/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095503 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512700 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/52, C08F4/54, C08F36/04 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
C08F36/04 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F136/06, C08F4/545 (US,EP);
C08F36/04, C08F4/52 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Title | German: | POLYMERISATIONSKATALYSATOR | [2005/10] | English: | POLYMERIZATION CATALYST | [2005/10] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE POLYMERISATION | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2004 | Translation filed | 03.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US2002119889 (KAITA SHOJIRO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [PX] - KAITA S ET AL, "HIGHLY SPECIFIC 1,4-CIS POLYMERIZATION OF 1,3-BUTADIENE", MACROMOLECULAR: RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (20030220), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1022-1336, pages 179 - 184, XP001047504 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.200390031 | International search | [X]WO0052062 (RIKEN [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2002256012 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO); | [A] - YU GANGQIAN ET AL., "Stereospecific polymerization of diolef-in in the presence of a new type of catalytic system based on cyclopentadienyl dichlorides of the lanthanides", KEXUE TONGBAO (FOREIGN LANGUAGE EDITION), (1984), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 421 - 422, XP002969584 |