EP1490317 - GLUCOCORTICOID MIMETICS, METHODS OF MAKING THEM, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEKKALI, Y., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 02 /
CARDOZO, Mario, G. 579 Miramar Avenue San Francisco, CA 94112 / US | 03 /
KIRRANE, T. M., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 04 /
KUZMICH, D., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road P.O. Box 368, Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 05 /
PROUDFOOT, J.R., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 06 /
TAKAHASHI, H., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 07 /
THOMSON, D., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 08 /
WANG, J., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 09 /
ZINDELL, R., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 10 /
HARCKEN, C.H.J.J., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 11 /
RAZAVI, H., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharm., Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Hammann, Heinz, Dr. c/o Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, CD Patents 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 03723790.6 | 21.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US08589 | Priority number, date | US20020367801P | 26.03.2002 Original published format: US 367801 P | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082787 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490317 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/23, A61K31/085, A61P29/00, A61P27/14, C07C255/54, C07C233/65, C07D307/79, C07D213/30 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C07C323/18 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07C235/42 (EP,US);
C07C251/48 (EP,US);
C07C255/53 (EP,US);
C07C255/54 (EP,US);
C07C317/22 (EP,US);
C07C37/055 (EP,US);
C07C39/367 (EP,US);
C07C39/373 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07C45/004 (EP,US);
C07C45/30 (EP,US);
C07C45/44 (EP,US);
C07C45/45 (EP,US);
C07C45/63 (EP,US);
C07C45/673 (EP,US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
C07C45/69 (EP,US);
C07C47/575 (EP,US);
C07C49/233 (EP,US);
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
C07C49/577 (EP,US);
C07C49/83 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07C59/56 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C37/055, C07C39/367 (US,EP);
C07C37/055, C07C39/373 (US,EP);
C07C45/004, C07C49/84 (US,EP);
C07C45/30, C07C49/255 (US,EP);
C07C45/44, C07C47/575 (US,EP);
C07C45/45, C07C49/84 (US,EP);
C07C45/63, C07C49/255 (EP,US);
C07C45/673, C07C49/255 (EP,US);
C07C45/673, C07C49/577 (EP,US);
C07C45/68, C07C49/255 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLUCOCORTICOID-MIMETIKA, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, SIE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2005/01] | English: | GLUCOCORTICOID MIMETICS, METHODS OF MAKING THEM, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS, AND USES THEREOF | [2005/01] | French: | MIMETIQUES DU GLUCOCORTICOIDE, PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE CES MIMETIQUES, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0154528 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,8-15 * page 36, line 20; claims 7-10 *; | [A]EP0311447 (FARMOS OY [FI]) [A] 1-30 * whole document * |