EP1499597 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR INDUCING APOPTOSIS IN PROLIFERATING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1960 Kenny Road Columbus Ohio 43210-1063 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, Ohio 43210-1063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ching-Shin 1840 Suffolk Road Upper Arlington, OH 43221 / US | 02 /
SONG, Xueqin 3061 International Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | 03 /
LIN, Ho-Pi 1180 Chambers Road, Apt. 111B Columbus, OH 43212 / US | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03723936.5 | 08.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003US10738 | Priority number, date | US20020370664P | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 370664 P | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03086287 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1499597 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/12, A61K31/415, A61P35/00, C07D403/04 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D263/38 (EP,US);
C07D307/58 (EP,US);
C07D333/18 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/04] | C07D231/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR INDUKTION VON APOPTOSE IN PROLIFERIERENDEN ZELLEN | [2005/04] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR INDUCING APOPTOSIS IN PROLIFERATING CELLS | [2005/04] | French: | COMPOSES ET METHODES PERMETTANT D'INDUIRE L'APOPTOSE CHEZ DES CELLULES DE PROLIFERATION | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 03.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PENNING ET AL, "Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of the 1,5-Diarylpyrazole Class of Cyclooxygenase-2 Inhibitors: Identification of 4-[5-(4-Methylphenyl)-3- (trifluoromethyl)-1H-pyrazol-1-yl]benzenesul fonamide (SC-58635, Celecoxib", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1997), vol. 40, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1347 - 1365, XP002114833 [A] 1-17 * page 1356, column 1; tables 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960803q | [A] - VLEESCHAUWER DE M ET AL, "Remarkably mild and simple preparations of sulfinates, sulfonyl chlorides and sulfonamides from thioanisoles", SYNLETT, THIEME INTERNATIONAL, STUTTGART, DE, (199704), no. 4, ISSN 0936-5214, pages 375 - 377, XP002208178 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1997-801 | [PX] - ZHU J ET AL, "USING CYCLOOXYGENASE-2 INHIBITORS AS MOLECULAR PLATFORMS TO DEVELOP A NEW CLASS OF APOPTOSIS-INDUCING AGENTS", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, US DEPT. OF HEALTH, EDICATIONAND WELFARE, PUBLIC HEALTH, US, (20021204), vol. 94, no. 23, ISSN 0027-8874, pages 1745 - 1757, XP008041497 [PX] 1-17 * the whole document, especially page 1746, compound 38 * | International search | [X]US5466823 (TALLEY JOHN J [US], et al) |