EP1573445 - AUTOMATED SYSTEM FOR CONTROL AND DIAGNOSTICS FOR DISPENSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexible Products Company 1881 West Oak Drive Marietta GA 30061 / US | [2009/45] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states C.C.T. Manufacturing, Inc. 6411 Vicksburg Court Acworth, GA 30101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERFANE, Raymond 6411 Vickburg Court Acworth, GA 30101 / US | 02 /
COCCIADIFERRO, Edward P.O. Box 15001 Asheville, NC 28813 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03723944.9 | 07.04.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US10790 | Priority number, date | US20020120915 | 11.04.2002 Original published format: US 120915 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03087989 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573445 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G05B23/02 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
G05B23/0213 (EP,US);
B29B7/728 (EP);
B29B7/7404 (US);
B29B7/7409 (EP);
B29B7/7428 (EP);
B29B7/7433 (EP);
B29B7/7447 (EP);
F04C13/001 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0329 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | G06F17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2005/37] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES SYSTEM ZUR STEURUNG UND DIAGNOSE FÜR EIN AUSGABESYSTEM | [2005/37] | English: | AUTOMATED SYSTEM FOR CONTROL AND DIAGNOSTICS FOR DISPENSING SYSTEM | [2005/37] | French: | SYSTEME AUTOMATISE DESTINE A COMMANDER ET A DIAGNOSTIQUER DES SYSTEMES DE DISTRIBUTION | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1022104 (SEALED AIR S P A [IT]) [X] 38 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] *[A] 1 | International search | [A]US4285446 (RAPP JOHN S, et al); | [A]US4938007 (SPERRY CHARLES R [US]) |