EP1495394 - A COMPUTER SYSTEM INCLUDING A SECURE EXECUTION MODE - CAPABLE CPU AND A SECURITY SERVICES PROCESSOR CONNECTED VIA A SECURE COMMUNICATION PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale California 94088-3453 / US | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGRATH, Kevin, J. 22876 Huchinson Road Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | 02 /
STRONGIN, Geoffrey, S. 7210 Montana Norte Austin, TX 78731 / US | 03 /
GULICK, Dale, E. 11715 Astoria Drive Austin, TX 78738 / US | 04 /
HUGHES, William A. 852 Edgehill Drive Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 05 /
CHRISTIE, David, S. 6201 Needham Lane Austin, TX 78739 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP, 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2005/02] | Wright, Hugh Ronald Brookes Batchellor LLP, 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03724195.7 | 18.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US12659 | Priority number, date | US20020373571P | 18.04.2002 Original published format: US 373571 P | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03090052 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1495394 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1495394 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/02 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
G06F9/4403 (EP,US);
G06F1/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/74 (EP,US);
G06F9/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RECHNERSYSTEM MIT EINEM FÜR EINEN SICHEREN AUSFÜHRUNGSMODUS GEEIGNETEN CPU UND EINEM SICHERHEITSDIENST-PROZESSOR DIE ÜBER EINEN GESICHERTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSWEG MITEINANDER VERBUNDEN SIND | [2005/02] | English: | A COMPUTER SYSTEM INCLUDING A SECURE EXECUTION MODE - CAPABLE CPU AND A SECURITY SERVICES PROCESSOR CONNECTED VIA A SECURE COMMUNICATION PATH | [2005/02] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE COMPORTANT UNE UNITE CENTRALE CAPABLE DE FONCTIONNER DANS UN MODE D'EXECUTION SUR ET UN PROCESSEUR DE SERVICES DE SECURITE CONNECTES VIA UN CHEMIN DE COMMUNICATION SUR | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0849657 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 23 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0175565 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3 - page 12 * * figures 1A,1C *; | [A]US2002007456 (PEINADO MARCUS [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,8 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0280] - paragraph [0309] ** figure 13 *; | [A] - TED DOTY, A FIREWALL OVERVIEW, CONNEXIONS, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 20-23, (19950701), ISSN 0894-5926, XP000564023 [A] 1,2,5-7,10 * page 20 * |