EP1552214 - A SAFETY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davies, Kevin Stephen 11 Karo Place Duncraig Perth Western Australia 6023 / AU | [2011/43] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Davies, Kevin Stephen 11 Karo Place, Duncraig Perth, Western Australia 6023 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | [2011/39] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03724665.9 | 10.06.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003AU00707 | Priority number, date | AU20020002878 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: AU 2002002878 | AU20020950078 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: AU 2002950078 | AU20020951351 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: AU 2002951351 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03104711 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552214 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552214 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16P3/14, B30B15/10 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F16P3/144 (EP,US);
B30B15/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSYSTEM | [2005/28] | English: | A SAFETY SYSTEM | [2005/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2011 | 01.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2003 | AT | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | ES | 06.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | IE | 10.06.2012 | LU | 10.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
LU | 10.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 26.10.2011 | |
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 26.10.2011 | |
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10033608 (PILZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [X]AU2708492 (APPLEYARD THOMAS JOHN); | [X]WO9725568 (APPLEYARD THOMAS JOHN [AU], et al); | [X]EP0995942 (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI GRANDI IMPI [IT]); | [X]WO0067932 (LAZER SAFE PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]JP2001071192 (NATL INST OF IND SAFETY MINIST, et al) |