EP1625892 - PNEUMATIC, LIQUID-DISPENSING GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrias Penalver, S.L. Pol. Ind. El Tapiado 30500 Molina de Segura (Murcia) / ES | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENALVER GARCIA, José Pol. Ind. El Tapiado 30500 Molina de Segura, Murcia / ES | [2007/13] |
Former [2006/08] | 01 /
PENALVER GARCIA, José Pol. UInd. El Tapiado 30500 Molina de Segura, Murcia / ES | ||
Former [2006/07] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel UDAPI & Asociados Explanada 8 28040 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel UDAPI & Asociados Patentes y Marcas Explanada, 8 28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 03725220.2 | 22.05.2003 | [2006/07] | WO2003ES00237 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103571 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625892 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625892 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/32 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
B05B1/306 (EP,US);
B05B9/01 (EP,US);
B05C5/0225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTDRUCKPISTOLE FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSABGABE | [2006/07] | English: | PNEUMATIC, LIQUID-DISPENSING GUN | [2006/07] | French: | PISTOLET A COMMANDE PNEUMATIQUE POUR LA DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDES | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2005 | Translation filed | 17.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 04.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.03.2007 | BE | 28.03.2007 | CY | 28.03.2007 | CZ | 28.03.2007 | EE | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | NL | 28.03.2007 | RO | 28.03.2007 | SI | 28.03.2007 | SK | 28.03.2007 | TR | 28.03.2007 | IE | 22.05.2007 | LU | 22.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | BG | 28.06.2007 | SE | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | HU | 29.09.2007 | [2023/28] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
TR | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
LU | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
HU | 29.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
TR | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
IT | 22.05.2007 | ||
LU | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
HU | 29.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
IT | 22.05.2007 | ||
LU | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
IT | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
IT | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
IT | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
IT | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
BE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4360132 (VILAGI BURTON J, et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0437112 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5261610 (WARYU JOSEPH C [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 51 - column 13, line 58; figure - *; | [A]US5934521 (YAMADA TAKEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 38 - column 9, line 67; figure - * |