07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
01.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
23.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
02.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
19.03.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
12.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
25.12.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
20.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
13.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
06.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
30.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
10.04.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.09.2008 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
05.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2008 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.09.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.07.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
20.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
23.11.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.11.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.11.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
29.07.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
26.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
14.01.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
03.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|