EP1509161 - JOINT AND DENTAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Active Implants Corporation 5865 Ridgeway Center Parkway, Suite 218 Memphis, TN 38120 / US | [2007/26] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Discure Ltd 11 Lochamei Galipoli Street 42920 Moshav Avihail / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBERG, Amiram 11 L. Galipoli Street Moshav Avihail / IL | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/51] | Lucas, Phillip Brian, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road GB-Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03725554.4 | 21.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003IL00416 | Priority number, date | US20020383483P | 23.05.2002 Original published format: US 383483 P | WO2002IL00972 | 03.12.2002 Original published format: PCT/IL0200/972 | WO2003IL00063 | 24.01.2003 Original published format: PCT/IL0300/063 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03099156 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509161 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509161 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61L27/18, A61F2/30, A61F2/34, A61F2/38, A61F2/36 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
A61C8/00 (EP,US);
A61C8/0012 (EP,US);
A61C8/0018 (EP,US);
A61C8/0036 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/30771 (EP,US);
A61F2/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/38 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30069 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3007 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30143 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30243 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30289 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30291 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30322 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/305 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30614 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30652 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30673 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3082 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30822 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30823 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30827 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30883 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30906 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30934 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30943 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP,US);
A61F2002/342 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3462 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0017 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0071 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0026 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00796 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELENK- UND ZAHNIMPLANTATE | [2005/09] | English: | JOINT AND DENTAL IMPLANTS | [2005/09] | French: | IMPLANTS ARTICULAIRES ET DENTAIRES | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2008 | 18.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.05.2009 | BE | 13.05.2009 | CY | 13.05.2009 | CZ | 13.05.2009 | DK | 13.05.2009 | EE | 13.05.2009 | FI | 13.05.2009 | NL | 13.05.2009 | RO | 13.05.2009 | SI | 13.05.2009 | SK | 13.05.2009 | TR | 13.05.2009 | IE | 21.05.2009 | LU | 21.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | BG | 13.08.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | GR | 14.08.2009 | PT | 13.09.2009 | HU | 14.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
LU | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
LU | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE923383 (TIMMERMANS FRANS DONATUS DR ME) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]US4195409 (CHILD FRANK W [US]) [X] 30,31 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 32 *; | [A]US5026280 (DUERR WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 30,31 * abstract *; | [X]WO9217127 (LUMICISI FABRIZIO [IT], et al) [X] 30,31 * page 3, line 13 - line 19 *; | [X]EP0698382 (HOWMEDICA [IE]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 38 - line 45 * * page 3, line 36 - line 42 *; | [X]WO9710776 (LIMBER LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 22, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph 1 * * figure 9C *; | [X]WO9741809 (BMP S A [FR], et al) [X] 30,31 * page 5, line 37 - page 6, line 15 *; | [A]US5824079 (SIEGLER SORIN [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 30 * * column 20, line 25 - line 38 ** figure 15 *; | [X]CA2361420 (BENOIST GIRARD SAS [FR]) [X] 1,2; | [XP]EP1208819 (BENOIST GIRARD SAS [FR]) [XP] 1,2 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 24 * |